BEING BEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 November 2015: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNY CONDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALLYN CONDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MORRIS CONDON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 831 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 831 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1196 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1196 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1561 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1561 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - RAISING AWARENESS OF SEPSIS WHICH AFFECTS CHILDREN - PROVIDING INFORMATION TO IMPROVE METHODS OF EARLY DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT SUPPORTING OF SEPSIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINDSOR MANSIONS
CAMP ROAD NORTH
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS23 2EW
- Phone:
- 07808776211
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window