SOUTH WALES GAY MEN'S CHORUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN APPRECIATION OF AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE LGBT COMMUNITY, IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS. (2) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE LGBT COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 04 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Rees | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Keeble | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Evans | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Krisitian Zgorzelski | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Huw Cook | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Thomson | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Lawrence Fletcher | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Robert Hawkins | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.32k | £5.33k | £7.30k | £24.80k | £17.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.82k | £6.66k | £5.51k | £15.77k | £18.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 January 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 SEP 2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN APPRECIATION OF AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE LGBT COMMUNITY, IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SEES FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS TO THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARD. (2) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE LGBT COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; B. PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; C. CULTIVATING SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE DIVERSITY OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 St. Josephs Mews
PENARTH
South Glamorgan
CF64 1NP
- Phone:
- 07557194245
- Email:
- treasurer@swgmc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window