Financial history THE NOTTINGHAM IRISH CENTRE

Charity number: 1165907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.73k £2.49k £24.98k £36.73k £47.64k
Total expenditure £20.42k £14.44k £22.02k £62.69k £58.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £9.36k N/A £9.00k