Trustees THE SEVERFIELD FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1165361

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Dunsmore | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Leith | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Nixon-Smith | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Cope | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Achilles | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matt Gamble | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER WILLIAMS | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK SANDERSON | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.