HAEMOCHROMATOSIS INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Haemochromatosis International (HI) is an alliance of haemochromatosis associations, all are welcome. We aim to advance the health of people with haemochromatosis everywhere. Our priorities are: To improve awareness of haemochromatosis throughout the world The geographical expansion of the alliance To develop an internationally recognised set of guidelines for the treatment of haemochromatosis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Brazil
- Canada
- Denmark
- France
- Germany
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Italy
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Portugal
- Scotland
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 30 March 2016: CIO registration
- IAHA (Working name)
- INTERNATIONAL ALLIANCE OF HAEMOCHROMATOSIS ASSOCIATIONS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Dianne Margaret Prince | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andres Alejandro Vadillo Canto | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Yssel | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael Johnston | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christine O'Leary | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MIRIAM FORDE | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ketil Toska | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prof Rob Evans | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD MICHAEL DON | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emerencia Teixeira | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £809 | £408 | £896 | £6.48k | £807 | |
|
Total expenditure | £113 | £102 | £234 | £607 | £810 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 30 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH HAEMOCHROMATOSIS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. INCREASING AWARENESS OF HAEMOCHROMATOSIS, 2. PROMOTING ADVANCES IN DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT, AND PREVENTION OF HAEMOCHROMATOSIS, 3. CONTRIBUTING TO BASIC AND CLINICAL RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF IRON METABOLISM, THROUGH A NETWORK OF COLLABORATING NATIONAL HAEMOCHROMATOSIS ASSOCIATIONS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONG FIELD HOUSE
STATION ROAD
BRATTON FLEMING
BARNSTAPLE
EX31 4TZ
- Phone:
- 01598710239
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window