ATI EVOLUTION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ati Evolution Foundation is a charitable endowment raising money in support of professionally run NGOs and Non-profit Organisations dedicated to preservation of Tibetan culture and humanitarian relief in the Himalayan region. Key areas of focus are on NGOs and Non-profits supporting Tibetan language, Tibetan medicine, Tibetan arts and Tibetan Buddhism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- China
- Italy
- Japan
- Mexico
- Romania
- Spain
- Ukraine
- United States
Governance
- 13 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK FARRINGTON | Chair | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Leonardo Isacchi | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR Charles Oliphant of Rossie | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.82k | £12.71k | £12.37k | £8.39k | £9.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.52k | £11.70k | £15.23k | £55.63k | £45.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 13 APR 2016 AMENDED ON 20 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE INCOME AND PROPERTY OF THE CIO UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE PROPERTY, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: - THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION AND EDUCATION IN ITS TEACHINGS - THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Sovereign Court
ASCOT
Berkshire
SL5 0HH
- Phone:
- 07909974692
- Email:
- mark@atievolution.org
- Website:
-
ww.atievolution.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window