Trustees EAST BOLDRE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1164549

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL HUSBAND | Chair | 12 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Neil Clogg | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marc Heighway | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Pocock | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Ashmead | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Upton | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jervis Edward John Devonshire | Trustee | 15 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
GINA ANTCZAK | Trustee | 15 May 2007 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.