WAY WIDOWED AND YOUNG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
i. To advance the education of the public to raise the awareness of the needs of people who are widowed and young. ii. To relieve persons in need, following bereavement by offering a peer-to-peer support network for anyone aged 50 or under, at time of bereavement, who is overcoming the loss of a partner, married or not, with or without children, inclusive of any sexual orientation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 December 2015: CIO registration
- 08 December 2016: Funds received from 1072649 WAY WIDOWED AND YOUNG
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Sedley-Burke | Chair | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nadir Keshani | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Bowsher | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Marcos Eleftheriou | Trustee | 10 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roberta Kelly | Trustee | 10 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Etherington | Trustee | 12 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jane Dodds | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Denise Siegler | Trustee | 09 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Alan Scarbrough | Trustee | 19 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.30k | £300.75k | £254.03k | £264.99k | £261.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.10k | £211.90k | £226.16k | £317.97k | £333.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Dec 2015 as amended on 24 Sep 2021 as amended on 31 Oct 2022 as amended on 02 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: (1) to advance the education of the public to raise the awareness of the needs of people who are widowed and young; (2) to relieve persons in need, following bereavement by offering a peer-to-peer support network for anyone aged 50 or under, at rime of bereavement, who is overcoming the loss of a partner, married or not, with or without children, inclusive of sexual orientation, gender, race and religion.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WAY Widowed and Young
Advantage House
Stowe Court
Stowe Street
Lichfiel
- Phone:
- 0300 2010051
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window