GOOD VIBRATIONS GIVING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of those in need, by reason of youth, age, ill health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage through the direct giving of essential gifts through our charity website. Local Charity Partners will register requests from their service users and our donors will buy them for them. Currently in the London Borough of Wandsworth only.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 11 April 2016: CIO registration
- 16 August 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 16 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1190241 Kingston Giving
- G V GIVING (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £415 | £38 | £3.18k | £5 | £8 | |
|
Total expenditure | £921 | £60 | £69 | £96 | £3.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE LIVING IN ENGLAND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A WEBSITE TO FACILITATE THE MAKING OF CHARITABLE DONATIONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window