THE SURATI MUSLIM KHALIFA SOCIETY (LEICESTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefits of the inhabitants of the United Kingdom, without distinction of sex or of political, religious or other opinions, by associating with local authorities, voluntary organisations and inhabitants in a common effort to advance education and training and to provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with objectives of improvi
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 19 January 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nazir Hussein Osman Khalifa | Chair | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fakirbhai Ismail Shaikh | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arshad Jamal | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Ayub Khalifa | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Ilyash Ibrahim Shaikh | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Shabir Ahmed Ismail Ibrahim | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.56k | £17.69k | £4.07k | £8.76k | £28.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.95k | £13.20k | £7.42k | £8.07k | £17.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2022 | 220 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 September 2022 | 585 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 1977 as amended on 22 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE MUSLIM RELIGION OR FAITH THROUGH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE DOCTRINES AND TENETS OF THE SAID RELIGION OR FAITH AND OF THE OBSERVANCES THAT SERVE TO PROMOTE AND MANIFEST IT AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A MUSLIM TEMPLE FOR THE PURPOSE OF PUBLIC RELIGIOUS WORSHIP AND OTHER RELIGIOUS CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LEICESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
127 Mere Road
Leicester
LE5 5GQ
- Phone:
- 07718903738
- Email:
- smksleicester@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window