SPACESHIP EARTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dispelling misinformation, conspiracy theories, tearing down barriers of inclusion. We operate online educational meetings to allow anyone in the world to participate, teaching people how they can be tricked into believing misinformation around health, finance, science and anti-Semitism. Fighting Holocaust denial through the restoration and colourisation of historical footage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Germany
- Israel
- New Zealand
- United States
Governance
- 01 December 2015: CIO registration
- GSA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN LINDSAY MACKENZIE | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY STUART CAMPBELL FCA | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.57k | £13.71k | £462 | £7.18k | £11.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.15k | £11.92k | £933 | £1.30k | £13.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF: THE POOR, THE NEEDY AND SICKNESS; THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES; ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
530 Oxford Road
Reading
Berkshire
RG30 1EG
- Phone:
- 07707462299
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window