RIDGEWAY COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the charity is the advancement of the Christian religion and the relief of those in need, in accordance with the teachings of Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £18,422 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Germany
- India
- South Africa
Governance
- 05 September 2016: CIO registration
- 10 December 2018: Funds received from 283919 RIDGEWAY COMMUNITY CHURCH
- N/A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amal Nishanth Joseph | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Eady | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pastor William Joseph Bassett MTh | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Darrell Perrins | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARETH MARTIN LLOYD-JONES | Trustee | 24 June 2016 |
|
|||||
MARTIN BRIAN SHREEVE | Trustee | 24 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
QUILLON KARL HARPHAM | Trustee | 24 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.29k | £229.01k | £290.14k | £270.18k | £303.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.85k | £226.39k | £213.63k | £258.71k | £276.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £15.79k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.87k | £18.29k | N/A | £19.65k | £18.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF JESUS CHRIST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIDGEWAY CHRISTIAN CENTRE
21B + 22 ST MARY'S STREET
Wallingford
OX10 0EW
- Phone:
- 01491832718
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window