ETERNAL COMMUNITY MEDIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are completing media training course for people in drug and alcohol recovery. Our volunteers are engaged in writing, scripting, filming and editing a short film. Eternal have been commissioned to work with volunteers from the recovery community to make films about Arson crime, New psychoactive substances and the building of a new local super prison.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
- Wrexham
Governance
- 02 March 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL LACEY | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Shaw | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Nadine Marston | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.77k | £45.63k | £37.20k | £20.20k | £44.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.29k | £289 | £52.94k | £33.16k | £36.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £20.84k | £29.40k | £25.83k | £10.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.43k | £16.00k | £8.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF OFFENDERS AND EX-OFFENDERS AND THOSE AT RISK OF OFFENDING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING, PROMOTING, SUPPORTING OR ORGANISING THE RECRUITMENT, EMPLOYMENT, EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN FILM MDEIA AND PRODUCTION OF OFFENDERS, EX-OFFENDERS AND THOSE AT RISK OF OFFENDING WITH THE VIEW TO HELP THEM SETTLE INTO AND ADJUST INTO SOCIETY AND HELP PREVENT THEM FROM RE-OFFENDING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bunker
Borras Road
Wrexham
LL13 9TW
- Phone:
- 07894341195
- Email:
- HELLO@ETERNALMEDIA.CO.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.ETERNALMEDIA.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window