Accounts and annual returns STOKE BLISS AND KYRE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 507049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 15 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 13 July 2024 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required