THE CONGREGATION OF MARIE AUXILIATRICE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of the religious and other charitable activities of the Congregation of the Society of Marie Auxiliatrice, including pastoral work in parishes, retreat ministry, youth work, educational work, school chaplaincies and liturgical ministry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Haringey
- Liverpool City
- Cameroon
- France
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Micronesia
- Philippines
- South Korea
Governance
- 08 January 2016: CIO registration
- 25 January 2017: Funds received from 230973 THE CHARITY OF THE SOCIETY OF MARIE AUXILIATRICE
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SISTER NATHALIE DJUICHOU | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SISTER ANN SWORDS | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SISTER TERESA BROGAN | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SISTER ELIZABETH O'BRIEN | Trustee | 08 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SISTER MARY FRAWLEY | Trustee | 08 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SISTER EILEEN CARTIN | Trustee | 08 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £378.88k | £302.22k | £305.10k | £428.00k | £309.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £410.08k | £330.43k | £304.31k | £295.01k | £286.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Jan 2016 as amended on 13 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION THROUGH THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE CONGREGATIONAL LEADER SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor Flat
61 College Road
BROMLEY
BR1 3QG
- Phone:
- 02086957492
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window