BE KIND FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIEF OF POVERTY, PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER, SHELTER, CLOTHING, MEDICAL CARE AND EDUCATION, AND ORPHAN SPONSORSHIPS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Pakistan
Governance
- 05 April 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAHZAD AHMED | Chair | 09 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Hashmat Khan | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Ateeq Ahmed | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.31k | £248.24k | £558.53k | £187.50k | £256.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.54k | £236.45k | £584.71k | £199.75k | £228.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £558.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £580.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £4.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £11.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £568.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 June 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 June 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 SEP 2015
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF SUFFICIENT THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER, SHELTER, CLOTHING, MEDICAL CARE AND EDUCATION TO PEOPLE AFFECTED BY POVERTY INCLUDING ORPHANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 HIGHFIELD AVENUE
BURNLEY
BB10 2PR
- Phone:
- 07779148769
- Email:
- shahzadahmedqadri@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window