EDENBRIDGE COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteer service of First Response in Medical emergencies in the Edenbridge area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 12 November 2015: Standard registration
- EDENBRIDGE CFRS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Baker | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|||||
JEFF STREETS | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
POPPY WALSH | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK RAYBOULD | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
FIONA LEWIS | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HAIGH | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARIA BOXLEY | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2018 | 01/11/2019 | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £3.25k | £11.75k | £9.81k | £8.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.04k | £1.29k | £7.05k | £4.39k | £1.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days | |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 05 February 2023 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 02 December 2021 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 22 October 2020 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEVE OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONGST PEOPLE WITHIN THE EDENBRIDGE LOCALITY AND NEARBY VILLAGES BY PROVIDING TRAINED VOLUNTEERS TO ATTEND MEDICAL EMERGENCIES AS DIRECTED BY SOUTH EAST COAST AMBULANCE SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 SPRINGFIELD ROAD
EDENBRIDGE
TN8 5HQ
- Phone:
- 07879683928
- Email:
- edenbridgecfr@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window