Trustees JARVIS ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY
Charity number: 1167024

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD JAMES SKYRME | Chair | 28 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Rev Philip Harvey | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Stephen William Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
ANDY JOHNSON | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|||||
ANNETTE ANDREWS | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|||||
EDWARD G PEARSON-GREGORY | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEN MADDISON | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN POWELL | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|||||
NIGEL SELLAR | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.