Financial history CHRIST LEADERSHIP CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1164667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/10/2019 27/10/2020 27/10/2021 27/10/2022 27/10/2023
Total gross income £9.63k £6.52k £7.97k £8.30k £12.44k
Total expenditure £9.62k £6.00k £9.00k £6.30k £11.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A