Accounts and annual returns THE REPUBLIC OF THE IMAGINATION

Charity number: 1170418
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 May 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 27 May 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 27 May 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 27 May 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 27 May 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 27 May 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 27 May 2020 18 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 May 2020 Not Required