Financial history YSGOL DYFFRYN OGWEN PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507060
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2004 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008
Total gross income £2.03k £3.70k £609 £713 £662
Total expenditure £557 £1.40k £3.93k £1.87k £8
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A