RAINBOW SURPRISE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of recreational & leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare,designed to improve their conditions of life, Providing support & activities which develop their skills, capacities & capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature & responsible individuals.The relief of those in need,by reason age,ill-health,disability, financial hardship or other.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £111,655 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Salford City
Governance
- 04 January 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAKAR HUSSAIN | Chair | 04 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Noel John Hulse | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shabana Mirza | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sayed Aisha Batool Malik | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.31k | £209.72k | £146.70k | £148.92k | £238.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.45k | £104.30k | £177.15k | £200.03k | £226.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.34k | £109.55k | £69.83k | £15.79k | £111.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, RELIEVE NEEDS OF AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: · THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; · PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (B) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. (C) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crumpsall Community Hall
Cleveland Road
Crumpsall
Manchester
M8 4GS
- Phone:
- 07515110208
- Email:
- hello@rainbowsurprise.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window