THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE BENEFICE OF ST STEPHEN'S, GATEACRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 03 December 2015: Previously excepted registration
- 09 June 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 June 2018: Re-registered
- ST STEPHEN'S GATEACRE PCC LIVERPOOL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA SANDLAND | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Ian Driver | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl Sullivan | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Albert William Gregory | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Williams | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Margaret Mary Reid | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALANE CLAIRE STOCKWELL | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Frear | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Scott Robert Pughsley | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Margaret Morgan | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOY JARY | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.49k | £82.55k | £77.26k | £117.88k | £118.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.74k | £109.72k | £76.68k | £105.59k | £103.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 December 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 December 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 December 2022 | 415 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 December 2022 | 415 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. STEPHENS PARISH OFFICE
BELLE VALE ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L25 2PQ
- Phone:
- 01514878480
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window