CHINLEY BUXWORTH & BROWNSIDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community Association provides a range of activities and events for residents of all ages. These include arts & crafts groups, health and fitness classes and regular events aimed at improving and maintaining health and wellbeing. An annual Summer Fete is held in July and a Christmas meal for our older residents takes place at the beginning of December.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,800 from 6 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 08 January 2016: CIO registration
- CBBCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD JOHN WINTERBOTTOM LLB HONS. | Chair | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jayne Green BSc | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Carolyn Wilkins OBE | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|||||
PHILIP ANTHONY MANFORD | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY LEVER | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JEAN PAGE BSC | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Connolly | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.51k | £18.65k | £49.23k | £50.34k | £199.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.42k | £16.64k | £38.71k | £47.43k | £86.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.30k | £21.17k | £2.64k | £2.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 February 2025 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 February 2025 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 08 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT ALL RESIDENTS OF CHINLEY, BUXWORTH AND BROWNSIDE PARISH (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE PARISH") AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR ALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chinley & Buxworth Centre
Lower Lane
Chinley
HIGH PEAK
SK23 6BE
- Phone:
- 01663750100
- Email:
- chairman@chinleyca.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window