OPEN DOOR STOKE ON TRENT

Charity number: 1166393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The mission of Open Door Stoke on Trent is to help the homeless and more vulnerable in the Stoke on Trent and North Staffordshire areas. Open Door Stoke on Trent vision is that nobody in Stoke on Trent and the surrounding area should go hungry or homeless.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £357,618
Total expenditure: £349,577

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire
  • Stoke-on-trent City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 April 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VANESSA RENSHAW Chair 17 August 2017
None on record
Lynne Ball Trustee 17 August 2017
THOMAS VIGER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ST LUKE'S WELLINGTON EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
ROGER WRIGHT Trustee 17 August 2017
None on record
AMY CALVERT Trustee 17 August 2017
None on record
LISA TOMKINSON Trustee 17 August 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £66.33k £323.89k £422.56k £266.50k £357.62k
Total expenditure £59.32k £305.18k £334.46k £282.28k £349.58k
Income from government contracts £29.03k £276.13k £44.44k £28.74k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.04k £2.87k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Open Door Stoke on Trent
69 CHURCH STREET
STOKE ON TRENT
ST4 1DQ
Phone:
07715107014