Financial history LOVER COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1164291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £25.66k £37.67k £23.50k £27.96k £17.09k
Total expenditure £24.77k £72.09k £11.19k £33.70k £29.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.80k £16.73k £2.67k £10.60k N/A