LOVER COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lover Community Trust is seeking to provide buildings and other facilities for the use of the community. Current activities consist of negotiating the purchase of the former Redlynch Primary School in Lover, and fundraising to facilitate this purchase and the subsequent renovation of the building to bring it into community use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 06 November 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICK GIBBS | Chair | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Louise Rogers | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Clarke | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clarke | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Peter Easton | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dave Charles | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Budworth | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marlene Louise Duggans | Trustee | 04 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.66k | £37.67k | £23.50k | £27.96k | £17.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.77k | £72.09k | £11.19k | £33.70k | £29.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.80k | £16.73k | £2.67k | £10.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 06 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE: TO FACILITATE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY BUILDINGS AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR USE BY INHABITANTS OF LOVER AND REDLYNCH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old School
School Road
Lover
SALISBURY
SP5 2PW
- Phone:
- 01725510317
- Email:
- heartbeat@lover.org.uk
- Website:
-
lover.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window