Grace Church Beckenham

Charity number: 1164443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Main public worship services including activities for school age children Mid-week meetings for the study of the Christian faith and pastoral support and care Courses & events for any wishing to find out about Christianity Carers & toddlers pre-school group The support & relief of Christians engaged full time in the missionary work of proclaiming the gospel & Christian discipleship

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £163,951
Total expenditure: £136,987

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley
  • Kenya

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 November 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • PARK LANGLEY CHURCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Lock Chair 17 November 2015
None on record
Ngan Thi Thu Jones Trustee 31 March 2022
None on record
SIMON COOKE Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Matthew Dew-Jones Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
ROSEMARY WORBOYS Trustee 04 May 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £43.16k £75.91k £118.09k £134.12k £163.95k
Total expenditure £38.16k £75.19k £105.85k £121.13k £136.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.51k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O CHURCH OFFICE
HIGHLAND ROAD
BROMLEY
BR1 4AA
Phone:
02084641898