Financial history MR BEE'S FAMILY CENTRE (KING'S LYNN)

Charity number: 1169475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £958.24k £916.98k £871.16k £800.04k £878.96k
Total expenditure £962.62k £804.28k £828.98k £889.62k £831.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £214.53k £29.15k £10.18k £43.65k
Income - Donations and legacies £47.88k £247.34k £73.99k £42.34k £66.05k
Income - Other trading activities £12.99k £278 £4.35k £4.07k £329
Income - Charitable activities £895.81k £666.26k £792.82k £753.63k £812.59k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £1.56k £3.10k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £962.62k £804.28k £828.98k £889.62k £831.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.20k £2.80k £3.36k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0