CZECH SCHOOL BERKSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purpose of Czech School Berkshire is to advance education for the public benefit in the language, history, geography, culture and heritage of the Czech Republic.We provide Czech teaching classes for children and adults and we also offer Czech&Slovak playgroup setting for younger children. We organize culturally-rich events & national celebrations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 27 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GABRIELA THOMAS | Chair | 23 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Zdenka Svobodova | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LUCIE FALLA | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETRA WOODWARD | Trustee | 23 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.13k | £25.21k | £28.69k | £31.01k | £37.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.40k | £24.46k | £24.08k | £34.18k | £39.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 241 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 241 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE CZECH SCHOOL BERKSHIRE IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE LANGUAGE, HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF THE CZECH REPUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Stoney Road
BRACKNELL
RG42 1XX
- Phone:
- 07974530313
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window