THE MISFITS THEATRE COMPANY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-Drama Workshops: playing drama games and devising original work based on people's own experiences and interests, regularly performing to the public. -Creative Training: tailor-made for professionals in the public, private and voluntary sector, using theatre to challenge perceptions and practices. -Rhythm of the Night: monthly inclusive ?nightclubs? for PWLD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £19,675 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 17 March 2016: CIO registration
- MISFITS (Working name)
- THE MISFITS THEATRE COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ripley Negus-Bullock | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Spencer | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Turner | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
KARINA CASTRO RASCON | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY RUSS | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.24k | £117.79k | £105.28k | £116.10k | £155.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.71k | £94.92k | £97.76k | £131.14k | £149.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.82k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.33k | £9.40k | £52.18k | £7.00k | £19.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES RANGING FROM THOSE WITH MODERATE LEARNING DISABILITIES TO THOSE WITH PROFOUND AND COMPLEX NEEDS IN BRISTOL, SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BATH AND NORTHEAST SOMERSET AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OF SAID PEOPLE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR LEARNING DISABILITIES AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A LOCAL NETWORK, SUPPORT AND ADVOCACY GROUP PROVIDING CREATIVE AND SOCIAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES IN BRISTOL, SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BATH & NORTHEAST SOMERSET.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Pauls Learning Centre
94 Grosvenor Road
BRISTOL
BS2 8XJ
- Phone:
- 0742 800 3985
- Email:
- info@misfitstheatre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window