BE ENRICHED ELEMENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are known as Be Enriched. We enrich community through food. Our projects strengthen community through food, build community, and provide skills training. We bring people together, share knowledge and cultivate long-standing relationships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £49,810 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
913 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
- Southwark
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 16 November 2016: CIO registration
- Be Enriched (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Williams | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rohan Mistry | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katy Gallagher | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Reid | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Coulson | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adelynne Obaduyi Akinola | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE MITCHISON | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.18k | £219.00k | £191.69k | £260.80k | £273.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.64k | £199.00k | £168.11k | £232.38k | £324.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £167.78k | £60.00k | £23.95k | £49.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 August 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 10 August 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST PEOPLE FROM SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY DELIVERING FREE COMMUNITY MEALS AND BY ADVANCING HEALTH AND NUTRITION EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 2. TO RELIEVE, ASSIST AND PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY PROVIDING FREE THERAPEUTIC SESSIONS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 3. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH EXPEDITIONS CARRIED OUT IN THE UK AND ABROAD FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING EXPERIENTIAL LEARNING AND NON-FORMAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPING INDIVIDUAL COMPETENCIES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING 4. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES AND NON-FORMAL EDUCATION AND MENTORING PROGRAMMES FOR AND WITH YOUNG PEOPLE, WHICH PROMOTE PARTICIPATION AND INTEGRATION IN SOCIETY AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF KEY PERSONAL SKILLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 Charlmont Road
LONDON
SW17 9AB
- Phone:
- 07397288160
- Email:
- hello@be-enriched.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window