UJALA WELFARE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
? GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES ? EDUCATION / TRAINING ? THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES ? THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 18 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AZIZ UR REHMAN | Chair | 18 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
HAIDER ZAMAN | Trustee | 18 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
RAFAQAT ALI KHAN | Trustee | 18 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED NISAR | Trustee | 18 February 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.76k | £124.68k | £126.03k | £179.34k | £102.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.16k | £110.15k | £135.90k | £181.02k | £95.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR, IN GHOURGHUSHTI, PAKISTAN AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS VIA MEDICAL CARE AND FREE AMBULANCE SERVICES; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR STUDENTS BY PROVIDING THEM WITH FUNDS SO THAT THEY CAN COMPLETE THEIR EDUCATION; AND THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING FUNDS FOR INDIVIDUALS IN NEED SPECIFICALLY FOR WEDDING SERVICES AND BURIAL AND FUNERAL SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 George Road
Edgbaston
BIRMINGHAM
B15 1NP
- Phone:
- 07971288361
- Email:
- ujalawelfareuk@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window