THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S WEST BLATCHINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England place of worship (Church)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 21 April 2016: Previously excepted registration
- ST PETER'S WEST BLATCHINGTON (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Helen Keeling | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Green | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Erica Casula | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jan Hendrik Butter | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zanita Beryl Thaxter | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna MacDonald Samuelsson | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Timothy Arthur John Gage | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Patrick Cooke | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
PETER MICHAEL IAN BLAKENEY | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
EMMA JANE DELACOUR | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MANDY CATHRYN GANDER | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAULA OLGA LIGHT | Trustee | 27 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN KEELING | Trustee | 27 April 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.05k | £87.61k | £80.36k | £93.82k | £100.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.56k | £104.68k | £106.52k | £147.96k | £119.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 SANDRINGHAM DRIVE
HOVE
BN3 6XD
- Phone:
- 01273271982
- Email:
- mandycgander@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window