Financial history SINGING GORILLA PROJECTS

Charity number: 1164315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £113.23k £87.09k £105.91k £93.09k £70.88k
Total expenditure £106.44k £102.15k £102.75k £77.55k £67.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A