Financial history WHITLEY COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1165275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £192.00k £186.01k £312.04k £250.51k £232.32k
Total expenditure £140.00k £165.54k £78.53k £192.18k £221.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.00k £32.00k £151.20k £8.01k