HUNTINGDONSHIRE FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are the governing body for Association Football played with the County of Huntingdonshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 20 April 2016: Standard registration
- 31 March 2017: Funds received from 1127240 HUNTINGDONSHIRE FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FU...
- HUNTS FA LTD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Frost | Chair | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Jayne Briault | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simone Joo Leng Warren | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lambert | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marina Howlett | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Hine | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brett Mickelburgh | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Scott Whelan | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARK IVES | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|||||
MAURICE ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Paul Stephen | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Barks | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298.64k | £263.12k | £296.63k | £401.47k | £187.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.34k | £281.49k | £316.28k | £389.12k | £216.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.90k | £35.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JUN 2016 as amended on 10 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT GENERALLY BUT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE COUNTY AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS: 3.1 TO PROMOTE, DEVELOP AND SUPPORT COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF THE GAME AND SUCH OTHER SPORTS OR PHYSICAL ACTIVITIES WHICH IMPROVE FITNESS AND HEALTH (FACILITIES IN THIS ARTICLE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2 TO ADVANCE AMATEUR SPORT BY PROMOTING THE AMATEUR PLAYING OF THE GAME AND SUCH OTHER SPORTS OR GAMES WHICH PROMOTE HEALTH BY INVOLVING PHYSICAL OR MENTAL SKILL OR EXERTION AND WHICH ARE UNDERTAKEN ON AN AMATEUR BASIS; 3.3 TO HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF THE GAME AND OTHER SPORTS AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SOCIAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY; AND 3.4 TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, LEARNING DIFFICULTIES OR ILL-HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF THE GAME AND OTHER SPORT, RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Armstrong House
4 Sovereign Court
Lancaster Way
Ermine Business Park
Huntingdon
PE29 6XU
- Phone:
- 01480447480
- Email:
- info@huntsfa.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window