1 DOG AT A TIME RESCUE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 Dog At A Time is a group of volunteers who are dedicated to rescuing Romanian street and stray dogs and finding them loving homes here in the UK. We have a shelter in Romania where the dogs are kept safe, warm, have regular meals and given lots of loving care and attention. 1 Dog has funded dog neutering programmes and education programmes in local schools, which are essential for the long term.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Romania
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAYNE WATTS | Chair | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Phillipa Jane Scott | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Clarkson | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Virginia Holton | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Andrew Rea | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julia Candida Webb | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUNE CHAPMAN | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.01k | £106.91k | £109.34k | £134.97k | £170.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.94k | £84.78k | £130.52k | £115.99k | £152.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 OCT 2015 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR DOGS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR DOGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONGST ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY DOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Freeths Llp
80 Mount Street
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 6HH
- Phone:
- 0111111111
- Email:
- ianrea66@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window