THE CRESCENT INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS AND ADULT LEARNING PROGRAMMES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
- Leicestershire
- North Yorkshire
- India
Governance
- 04 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OMAIR NAUSHAD AZIZ | Chair | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAHOMED HANIF HUSSEIN | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED DAUD | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED REHAN SULEMAN HUSSEIN | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.36k | £67.18k | £40.13k | £61.98k | £77.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.35k | £55.05k | £50.05k | £60.04k | £78.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 March 2025 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 March 2025 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 JUN 2015 DATED 12/06/2015
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS AND ADULT LEARNING PROGRAMMES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (II) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QUR'AAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MOHAMMAD (PBUH) AS DEFINED AND INTERPRETED BY THE AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMA'AH SCHOOL OF THOUGHT; (III) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, THE DISABLED, VICTIMS OF NATURAL AND MAN-MADE DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR FOOD, CLOTHING, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (IV) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE POOR, UNDERPRIVILEGED AND PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, EQUIPMENT, MEDICINES OR GRANTS FOR MEDICAL DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT, OR PROVISION OF HEALTH EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Sutcliffe Street
BOLTON
BL1 8EX
- Phone:
- 07715922635
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window