NENTHEAD MINES CONSERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to Educate people about mining at Nenthead and in the North Pennines by researching, restoring, maintaining, owning and exploring the historic and natural features relating to mining,quarrying and smelting. We guide people into an old lead and zinc mine, carry out maintenance of the ancient monument, hold an archive of documents and have a collection of mining artefacts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £56,809 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cumbria
- Durham
- Northumberland
Governance
- 30 March 2016: CIO registration
- 07 February 2023: Funds received from 1137467 THE FRIENDS OF THE NORTH PENNINES AONB AND EUROPEA...
- NMCS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GOUGH | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hopkirk | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Allan Richardson | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Vidler | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andy Hopkirk | Trustee | 09 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICK GREEN | Trustee | 09 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jackson | Trustee | 27 May 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.38k | £7.02k | £34.06k | £30.44k | £76.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.92k | £11.90k | £30.04k | £30.99k | £72.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.10k | £12.55k | £56.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2021 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2021 | 268 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 30 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT MINING, QUARRYING AND SMELTING AT NENTHEAD AND IN THE NORTH PENNINES BY (A) RESEARCHING, RESTORING, MAINTAINING, OWNING AND EXPLORING THE HISTORIC AND NATURAL FEATURES RELATING TO MINING, QUARRYING AND SMELTING AT NENTHEAD AND ADJACENT MINING AREAS; (B) ENCOURAGING AND ADVOCATING THE CONSERVATION OF THE REMAINS OF THE MINING, QUARRYING AND SMELTING INDUSTRIES; AND CONSERVATION OF THE GEOLOGICAL FEATURES AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, BOTH ABOVE AND BELOW GROUND LEVEL; (C) UNDERTAKING ARCHAEOLOGY PROJECTS, (D) RECORDING AND ARCHIVING INFORMATION, AND (E) SHARING AVAILABLE INFORMATION WITH THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nenthead Mines Conservation Society
Nenthead
ALSTON
Cumbria
CA9 3PD
- Phone:
- 07494497868
- Email:
- admin@nentheadmines.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window