Financial history PORTLAND BIRD OBSERVATORY AND FIELD CENTRE

Charity number: 1164156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £136.87k £88.16k £110.22k £237.80k £580.69k
Total expenditure £115.33k £124.37k £84.22k £210.45k £132.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £444.95k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £59.76k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £75.97k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £442.65k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £132.08k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0