PORTLAND BIRD OBSERVATORY AND FIELD CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates at Portland Bill a bird observatory and field centre for the study of bird migration and other aspects of the natural history of the Isle of Portland; publishes and distributes useful results of this work; promotes and participates in the conservation of the natural environment of the Isle of Portland; preserves and maintains the historic building known as the Old Lower Light.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£580,686
Donations and legacies | £444.95k | |
Charitable activities | £59.76k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £75.97k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£132,077
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £132.08k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £132.08k | |
Retained for future use | £448.61k |
People

2 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Dorset
Governance
- 28 October 2015: CIO registration
- 17 July 2018: Funds received from 211630 THE PORTLAND BIRD OBSERVATORY AND FIELD CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JOHN MORGAN | Chair | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Davidson | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Murphy | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cutts | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Davidson | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Luke Christopher Phillips | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
LUCY JESSICA CUMBERLAND | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nevil Howard Fowler | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Morgan | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Francis Phillips | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr GLEN THOMAS | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Craft | Trustee | 16 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.87k | £88.16k | £110.22k | £237.80k | £580.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.33k | £124.37k | £84.22k | £210.45k | £132.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £444.95k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £59.76k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £75.97k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £442.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £132.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.72m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.28m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £566.20k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 28 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC: (A) IN SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGE IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT LIMITATION IN NATURAL HISTORY GENERALLY AND IN ORNITHOLOGY IN PARTICULAR BY: (I) THE MAINTENANCE AT PORTLAND BILL IN DORSET OF A BIRD OBSERVATORY FOR THE STUDY OF BIRD MIGRATION AND BIRD BEHAVIOUR, AND THE MAINTENANCE OF A FIELD CENTRE TO FACILITATE THE STUDY OF ANY OTHER BRANCH OF NATURAL HISTORY OR SCIENTIFIC SUBJECT; (II) THE PROMOTION AND ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN THE CONSERVATION OF ALL ASPECTS OF NATURAL HISTORY AT THE ISLE OF PORTLAND IN DORSET; AND (III) THE PUBLICATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF STUDY RESEARCH AND FIELDWORK. (B) BY PRESERVING REPAIRING AND MAINTAINING THE HISTORIC BUILDING KNOWN AS THE OLD LOWER LIGHT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLD LOWER LIGHTHOUSE
PORTLAND BILL
PORTLAND
DORSET
DT5 2JT
- Phone:
- 01305820553
- Email:
- obs@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window