Financial history MAIDFORD VILLAGE CHARITY

Charity Number: 1166188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.25k £1.10k £10.74k £892 £1.06k
Total expenditure £403 £499 £3.05k £1.72k £775
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A