MEDISEARCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes and supports medical research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 30 January 1978: Standard registration
- 22 December 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LEICESTERSHIRE MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION (Working name)
- MEDI SEARCH (Working name)
- THE LEICESTER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL SCHOOL AND ASSOCIATED LEICESTER TEACHING HOSPITALS JOINT TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2012 | 30/11/2013 | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | 30/11/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.38k | £3.65k | £8.21k | £3.45k | £2.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £354 | £350 | £225 | £100 | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | 19 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | 30 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | 29 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 DECEMBER 1977 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 12 JUNE 1992 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 27 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE TEACHING HOSPITALS AND THE MEDICAL SCHOOL (AS DEFINED IN THE GOVERNING INSTRUMENT).
Area of benefit
AREA ADMINISTERED BY LEICESTERSHIRE AREA HEALTH AUTHORITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window