EAGLE RECOVERY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Initially funded by Islington Council to support borough residents exiting structured treatment for alcohol and/or drug addiction issues. Now self funding Eagle is a peer led volunteer charity providing physical and mental wellbeing activities to reduce isolation, encourage behaviour change and re engage with family and mainstream communities. through sport, yoga and safe social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Islington
Governance
- 04 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael James Timmins | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mick Havens | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ritchie Phillip | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Relf | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.00k | £52.60k | £50.27k | £13.36k | £55.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.00k | £26.25k | £66.00k | £33.98k | £22.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2021 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY - IMPROVING THE GOOD HEALTH AND MENTAL WELL-BEING OF PEOPLE RECOVERING FROM DRUG AND ALCOHOL ABUSE WITH THE AIM TO ACHIEVE POSITIVE CHANGE, PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND A HEALTHY ABSTINENCE LIFESTYLE; - PROVIDING FACILITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR LIFE SKILLS, PARTICIPATION IN SPORTS AND HEALTHY RECREATION; - PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION FOR THEIR BENEFIT AND USE; - SUPPORTING THEIR PARTICIPATION IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY; - IMPROVING THEIR AWARENESS OF THEIR PHYSICAL HEALTHY NEEDS THROUGH COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES; AND BY - OFFERING TRAINING WITH A VIEW TO INCREASING AND IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
28B KING HENRYS WALK
LONDON
N1 4PB
- Phone:
- 02033177277
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window