Accounts and annual returns SALSABEEL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165728
Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 December 2024 330 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 December 2024 694 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 April 2022 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 April 2022 63 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window