Financial history BURNING NIGHTS CRPS SUPPORT

Charity number: 1166522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £60.63k £54.29k £84.47k £64.84k £62.67k
Total expenditure £45.68k £25.18k £59.67k £80.05k £91.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A