MUJADDID ALF SANI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity to needy student who study at Islamic for their, including their accommodation, food, books, uniform etc other activities involve needy people to give food, help their daughters to get married etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Pakistan
Governance
- 28 June 2016: CIO registration
- MAST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SADAT AHMED | Chair | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Syed Mudassar Ahmad | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Masood Khan | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.30k | £6.50k | £11.06k | £15.91k | £14.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.87k | £7.38k | £16.37k | £17.42k | £18.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN NOTTINGHAM BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Gunthorpe Drive
Nottingham
NG5 3DW
- Phone:
- 07972377903
- Email:
- sadatahmed79@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window