PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, OXTED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St. Mary's Parish Church is working to be the church family meeting place to worship God, and bringing Gods love into Oxted and the wider world. St. Mary's PCC co-operates with the Vicar in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church, spiritual, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has responsibilities of stewardship for the church buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £17,000 from 17000 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 November 2015: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev James Paul Ashton | Chair | 07 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Emma Catherine Church | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Kyte | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Horsford | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marian Dalton | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Fisher | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Austin Copp | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katy Aspinwall | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE JANE NOCKLES | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID COURTNEY WEIGHTMAN | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA COPP | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MARK ADAMSON | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE LAWSON ADAMSON MBE | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
CATHARINA STIBE HICKSON | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.17k | £123.29k | £167.32k | £195.04k | £186.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.75k | £130.42k | £236.48k | £146.92k | £232.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £350 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | £17.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 January 2022 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 January 2022 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Office
c/o Oxted Community Hall
53 Church Lane
Oxted
Surrey
RH8 9NB
- Phone:
- 01883714263
- Website:
-
stmarysoxted.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window