Financial history THE CORNERSTONE TRUST

Charity number: 507105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.66k £41.63k £32.98k £32.66k £31.96k
Total expenditure £41.53k £30.48k £47.17k £35.94k £32.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.17k £2.67k N/A N/A